Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, subject to a certain exception, a former secretary of a principal department of the Executive Branch from assisting or representing another party for compensation, for 1 calendar year from the date the secretary leaves State office, in a matter that is the subject of legislative action.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0315
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page