Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Investigations by Inspectors General
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of records of investigations conducted by or investigatory files compiled by an inspector general whose office is created by State law or the laws of a political subdivision of the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0380
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Investigations by Inspectors General
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Investigations by Inspectors General
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page