Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person may not be denied the right to purchase, possess, or carry a firearm solely on the basis that the person is authorized to use medical cannabis.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0543
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0179 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/15/2020
Legislative Date
9/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/15/2020 9/15/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Firearms – Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry – Use of Medical Cannabis
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:50 PM
Click to return on the top page