Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 92
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying certain provisions on the hours of sale, in Baltimore City, for Class B-D-7 beer, wine, and liquor license holders to include that the hours of sale are 9 a.m. to 9 p.m. in the area bounded by Liberty Heights Avenue, Northern Parkway, Druid Park Drive, and Wabash Avenue; and making conforming changes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0168
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 92
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 92
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-2004, 12-2005, 12-905 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:53 PM