Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry - Use of Medical Cannabis
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Ready, and Smith
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person may not be denied the right to purchase, possess, or carry a firearm solely on the basis that the person is authorized to use medical cannabis.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1582
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0097 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {843424/1 (Senator Lam)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Firearms - Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry - Use of Medical Cannabis
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Lam) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Floor Amendment {843424/1 (Senator Lam) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Firearms - Right to Purchase, Possess, and Carry - Use of Medical Cannabis
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Referred Judiciary 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page