Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel Records - Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton's Law)
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a record relating to an administrative or criminal investigation of misconduct by a law enforcement officer is not a personnel record for purposes of certain provisions of the Public Information Act; authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of records relating to an administrative or criminal investigation of misconduct by a law enforcement officer; defining "law enforcement officer"; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0120
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Information Act - Personnel Records - Investigations of Law Enforcement Officers (Anton's Law)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 11:42 AM
Click to return on the top page