Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a motor carrier permit is not required for transportation services that a nonprofit organization provides through the use of a volunteer driver and the volunteer driver's personal vehicle; altering the definition of "transportation network services"; and providing that a nonprofit organization that provides transportation for remuneration to clients of certain services may not be required to obtain a motor carrier permit.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0120
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Text - Chapter - Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
(   10-101, 10-102, 9-201 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page