Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee, also referred to as the State team, to identify and address the factors contributing to suicide deaths and facilitate system changes in the State to prevent suicides; requiring the State team to meet at least quarterly each year, report at least annually to the Governor and the General Assembly, perform certain annual studies, and disseminate certain findings and recommendations to policymakers, health care providers, health care facilities, and the public; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0209
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {277678/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {277678/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 1:56 PM
Click to return on the top page