Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Smith, Bailey, Carter, Cassilly, Hettleman, Hough, Jackson, Lee, Sydnor, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a new officer of a humane society or a new animal control officer to receive at least 80 hours of training within 12 months of employment; requiring an officer of a humane society and an animal control officer to complete at least 6 hours of continuing education every year; requiring certain training and continuing education to include instruction on certain matters; and authorizing a unit of the county or municipal corporation to require training in addition to that which is specified in the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0281
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0814 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {828875/1 Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {828875/1 Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page