Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Carter, Ferguson, McCray, Sydnor, and Washington
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting Baltimore City Community College from certain provisions of the State procurement law; requiring the Board of Trustees of the College, subject to review and approval by the Board of Public Works and the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review, to develop certain policies and procedures governing procurement; requiring the Board of Trustees to develop an information technology plan that meets certain requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0207
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0254 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16-505, 16-505.3 )
(   11-203, 12-202, 3A-302, 3A-402, 4-401, 4-402, 4-406 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:52 PM
Click to return on the top page