Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that the Maryland Transit Administration must regularly consult with certain entities regarding the compilation and submission of the Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to submit a draft Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan to certain entities at least 45 days before the draft is finalized; altering the contents and elements of the Plan; requiring the Plan to be reviewed and updated every 6 years and to address a certain 30-year period; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0086
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1412 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-205, 3-216, 7-301.1, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:51 PM