Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Information
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from using contributor information from any report or statement required under provisions of law governing campaign finance for commercial solicitation purposes; and prohibiting a person from publishing contributor information from any report or statement required under provisions of law governing campaign finance in newspapers, magazines, books, or other similar media for the purpose of facilitating commercial solicitation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Information
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Campaign Finance - Protection of Contributor Information
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Ways and Means 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
(   13-106 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page