Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the State's Attorney for Baltimore City to establish a certain Diversionary and Reentry Program in Baltimore City for at-risk youth and youth offenders; requiring the Office of the State's Attorney for Prince George's County to establish a Diversionary and Reentry Program in Prince George's County for at-risk youth and youth offenders; establishing the purposes of the programs are to improve public safety, develop skills for at-risk youth, and reduce recidivism by youth offenders; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0068
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:51 PM
Click to return on the top page