Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Pilots in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2032, the termination provisions relating to certain statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2020
Legislative Date
1/02/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/02/2020 1/02/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Referred Economic Matters 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Text - Chapter - State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM
Click to return on the top page