Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Reilly (By Request - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2020, and on or before December 15, 2021; and extending the termination date for the Commission by 2 years to June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0044
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/28/2019
Legislative Date
8/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/28/2019 8/28/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 506
Text - Chapter - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page