Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain limitation on the applicability of the Prevailing Wage Law to the construction of a public work and applying the Prevailing Wage Law to construction of a certain public work funded in whole or in part with State funds; and altering the applicability of the Prevailing Wage Law to public work contracts by reducing the contract threshold amount from $500,000 to $250,000.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0037
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2020
Legislative Date
9/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2020 9/17/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Applicability
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/31/2021 6:46 PM
Click to return on the top page