Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain required envelopes used by certain voters voting by absentee ballot to return their ballots include prepaid postage; requiring the State Board of Elections to reimburse each local board of elections for 50% of the costs of prepaid postage included on ballot/return envelopes or return envelopes provided to a voter voting by absentee ballot; and requiring that absentee ballots be accompanied by instructions for the postage of certain absentee ballot envelopes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0881
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0343 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/12/2019
Legislative Date
8/12/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/30 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/4 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/12/2019 8/12/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Favorable 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Motion Special Order until 1/30 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Favorable Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Second Reading Passed 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/4 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Referred Ways and Means 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
(   9-310 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page