Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Membership Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Elfreth, Simonaire, and Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appoint five members, instead of three, to the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County; requiring that members be appointed from each legislative district in Anne Arundel County; limiting the number of terms that a member of the Board may serve to 4 consecutive terms; staggering the terms of members of the Board; altering certain requirements for political diversity among members of the Board; authorizing the Board, rather than the Governor, to designate a chair of the Board; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0757
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/08/2019
Legislative Date
8/08/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/08/2019 8/08/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Membership Revisions
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners Membership Revisions
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-201, 11-202, 11-203 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:46 PM