Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the authorization for the Governor, with the approval of the Board of Public Works, to reduce a certain appropriation to not more than a total of 25% of the appropriation in any fiscal year; and increasing to 10 the number of business days the Board must wait before approving a proposed reduction of an appropriation after the Secretary of Budget and Management publishes and provides certain notice of the proposed reduction.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0133
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/18/2020
Legislative Date
9/18/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/18/2020 9/18/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/29/2021 12:48 PM
Click to return on the top page