Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Secretary of State)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain classes of goods and services for which a person may register a mark; prohibiting a person from registering a certain name or surname as a mark; requiring an applicant for registration or renewal of a mark to submit 3 different specimens or reproductions of the mark as used; prohibiting the specimens or reproductions from including business papers, including letterhead, business cards or envelopes; requiring the Secretary of State to include a full description of the mark on a certificate of registration; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/26/2019
Legislative Date
8/26/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/26/2019 8/26/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments {197071/1 Adopted 13
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 15
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Referred Economic Matters 16
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-401, 1-404, 1-405, 1-406, 1-409, 1-410, 1-411 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:46 PM