Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing the Governor to transfer by budget amendment up to $50,000,000 from the Revenue Stabilization Account to fund costs associated with the Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19); requiring the Governor to provide the Legislative Policy Committee with at least 7 days for review before transferring funds; requiring, within 60 days of the release of funds, the Department of Budget and Management to submit a report to the Legislative Policy Committee and the General Assembly on the use of the funds per unit of State government; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1079
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Appropriations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {504266/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Budget - Revenue Stabilization Account Transfers - Coronavirus
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page