Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB1659 - 2020RS
   CH0033 - 2021RS
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 33 of 2021
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program to provide grants from the Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund to bring new youth and amateur events to the State and attract sports fans, participants, and tourists; requiring Maryland Sports to implement and administer the Program in a certain manner; requiring the Comptroller to distribute a certain amount of money from the State Lottery Fund to the Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund each fiscal year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {804063/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Overridden (105-27)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 33 of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Appropriations 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Fund
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {804063/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/8 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Overridden (105-27)
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Motion Special Order vote on veto until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Overridden (31-15)
House 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 33 of 2021
Text - Chapter - Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
(   10-601, 10-612.1, 10-612.2 )
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 10:34 AM
Click to return on the top page