Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring every employer in the State to allow any employee, rather than any employee who claims to be a registered voter, in the State a certain period of absence from work to vote in an election, rather than only on election day; requiring the employee to provide reasonable proof to the employer in a timely manner that the employee voted or attempted to vote; prohibiting an employer from taking certain actions against an employee who exercises the right under certain provisions of law to be absent from work to vote; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-35)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (94-35) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-315 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:41 PM