Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Barve, Buckel, Feldmark, Hornberger, Palakovich Carr, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Affordable Housing Development Credit Program within the Division of Development Finance of the Department of Housing and Community Development to provide certain owners of certain low-income housing projects certain tax credits for a certain number of years; authorizing an owner or a developer of a low-income housing project to submit a certain application to the Department to enroll in the Program on or after July 1, 2020, but before July 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0715
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-2701 through 4-2708 )
(   6-105.3, 6-303.1 )
(   10-749, 10-751, 8-222, 8-418 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:40 PM