Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Acevero, Anderton, D.M. Davis, Harrison, Hill, Hornberger, Kerr, Moon, Palakovich Carr, and Williams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a public general law may not be construed to limit a power or function of a local government unless the public general law specifically states that it limits concurrent jurisdiction or that the State's jurisdiction is exclusive; providing for the construction of the Act; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0756
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - General Provisions - Public General Law - Preemption of Local Laws
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:38 PM