Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Charkoudian, and Moon
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the length of time a zero-emission electric school vehicle may be operated from 12 years to 15 years, unless it fails to meet the applicable school bus and motor vehicle safety standards.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-10)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (124-10) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-804 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:36 PM