Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to encourage the establishment and expansion of makerspaces throughout the State; authorizing the Corporation to award certain financial assistance to local governments, certain designees of local governments, and certain nonprofit entities for the establishment of makerspaces in the State; requiring the Corporation, after consulting with the Secretary of Commerce, to adopt certain standards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0826
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {765060/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {765060/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-401, 10-495.1 through 10-495.5, 10-496, 9-101 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page