Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Barron, Carr, Dumais, Feldmark, Korman, Love, and Stein
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Oversight Review Board; requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for certain public-private partnerships presolicitation reports of certain contracts and a certain environmental impact statement under certain circumstances; requiring certain presolicitation reports to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee; prohibiting the Board of Public Works, under certain circumstances, from designating a public-private partnership; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {930614/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {413228/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-93)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {930614/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {413228/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-93) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (97-37) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10A-101, 10A-106, 10A-201, 10A-203, 10A-301, 10A-401 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page