Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian and Palakovich Carr
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "taxable service" under the sales and use tax to impose the tax on certain services; providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain materials, parts, and equipment used to repair, maintain, or upgrade aircraft or certain aircraft systems, and for certain qualified data center personal property for use at qualified data centers; requiring the Department of Commerce to verify certain eligibility; requiring the Comptroller to issue certain certificates of eligibility; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {395069/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {555860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (76-46)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {709434/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Services
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {395069/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {555860/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (76-46) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {709434/1 Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-236, 11-237 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page