Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Social Workers
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each nursing home and assisted living program in Baltimore City to designate a licensed social worker for each resident to serve as the resident's case manager; and authorizing a certain social worker to provide services for nursing home or assisted living program residents that will help them attain or maintain their physical, mental, and psychosocial status.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Social Workers
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-1410.3, 19-1807.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:27 PM
Click to return on the top page