Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions - Dispensing Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Johnson, Pena-Melnyk, Acevero, Arikan, Hill, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Parrott, Saab, Shetty, Szeliga, Valderrama, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Morgan, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain refill be dispensed in the smallest commercially available package under certain circumstances if a prescription cannot be dispensed or sold in a 14-day or less supply or unit of use.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions - Dispensing Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {956484/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions - Dispensing Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions - Dispensing Requirements
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {956484/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Refills of Prescriptions - Dispensing Requirements
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page