Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsored by
Delegates Cain, Henson, Bagnall, Bartlett, C. Branch, Feldmark, Guyton, Howard, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Rogers, Rose, Smith, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a school bus be routed with the intent that the number of pupils on the bus does not exceed the manufacturer's rated seating capacity for the bus; and providing that if an emergency or temporary situation causes the number of pupils on the bus to exceed the seating capacity, the situation shall be corrected within a reasonable period of time.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {850612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {850612/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51AClick to view Recorded Media
(   21-1118 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page