Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher and J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain circumstances under which an individual who has been convicted of a crime is not qualified for jury service; and repealing a provision specifying that an individual is not qualified for jury service if the individual has a certain charge pending for a certain crime.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-39)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48A
Text - Third - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (93-39) 49A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:25 PM