Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Ivey, Barron, Charles, and Williams
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing an exemption for certain check cashing services from provisions of law governing the licensure of check cashing services; authorizing a person to provide check cashing services without obtaining a certain license by registering each year with the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; requiring a person to obtain and maintain a certain identifier to register as a check cashing service; requiring a person to provide the Commissioner with certain information to register as a check cashing service; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0939
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883799/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {883799/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
(   12-102, 12-105, 12-105.1, 12-118 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page