Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain theatrical production entities to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain costs incurred for certain theatrical productions in the State; making the credit refundable under certain circumstances; requiring an entity to apply to the Department of Commerce to be a qualified theatrical production entity; requiring that to qualify for the credit certain estimated costs incurred in the State must exceed $100,000; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0577
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:24 PM