Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Names of Entities With Physician Membership – Approval Requirement – Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a professional entity whose members are licensed physicians from a requirement that the name of the entity be approved by the State Board of Physicians; authorizing the State Board of Physicians and MedChi after receiving a certain notice, to take certain actions and make certain referrals if there is reason to believe that the name of a certain professional entity violates the Maryland Consumer Protection Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578473/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Names of Entities With Physician Membership – Approval Requirement – Exemption
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Names of Entities With Physician Membership – Approval Requirement – Exemption
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {578473/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:08 PM
Click to return on the top page