Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz and Adams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on private property in Talbot County on a Sunday during the bow hunting season from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January the following year, inclusive, subject to certain provisions of law.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0312
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-11)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (122-11) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page