Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices
Sponsored by
Delegate Crutchfield
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services and the Department of Human Services to convene a workgroup with a public policy institute in the State to increase accountability for prevention and intervention services delivered to children by the Department of Juvenile Services through evidence-based, research-based, and culturally competent practices; requiring the workgroup to complete a baseline assessment and publish a certain inventory; requiring the workgroup to consider and identify certain factors; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0905
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Crutchfield) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {573623/1 (Delegate Crutchfield) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Crutchfield) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {573623/1 (Delegate Crutchfield) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 11:03 AM
Click to return on the top page