Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sickle Cell Trait Screening, Treatment, Education, and Public Awareness (Journey's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero, Washington, Anderson, B. Barnes, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, Charkoudian, Charles, Conaway, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Harrison, Haynes, Henson, Ivey, C. Jackson, M. Jackson, Kerr, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Qi, Queen, Rogers, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Stewart, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Wells, Wilkins, Williams, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Kelly, Bagnall, Chisholm, Morgan, Hill, Krebs, Rosenberg, Bhandari, Kipke, K. Young, Szeliga, Barron, Johnson, Saab
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Statewide Steering Committee on Services for Adults with Sickle Cell Disease to work in conjunction with members of the medical community in leading a certain comprehensive education and treatment program; requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in conjunction with local health departments and the Steering Committee, to develop a public awareness campaign on the importance of an individual knowing one's sickle cell trait status, receiving screening for the sickle cell trait and counseling under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1414 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {506281/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Sickle Cell Trait Screening, Treatment, Education, and Public Awareness (Journey's Law)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {506281/1 Adopted 43AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sickle Cell Trait Screening, Treatment, Education, and Public Awareness (Journey's Law)
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page