Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Clark
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 414
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Calvert County to decrease the maximum speed limit to not less than 15 miles per hour on certain highways in the Solomons Island area without performing an engineering and traffic investigation, regardless of whether the highway is inside an urban district.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 414
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 414
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Speed Limits - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-803 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM