Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsored by
The Speaker
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Racing Commission to establish the Equine Health, Safety, and Welfare Advisory Committee; requiring the owner of the Bowie Race Course Training Center to convey the property to the City of Bowie in a certain manner; authorizing, subject to the approval of the Board of Public Works, the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue up to $375,000,000 of bonds for the redevelopment of certain racing facilities, including Laurel Park and Pimlico; establishing certain funds for certain purposes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {155565/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {773921/1 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-8)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {839233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {155565/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {773921/1 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (122-8) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {839233/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
(   11-1203, 11-209, 11-213, 11-511, 11-519, 11-520, 11-521 )
(   10-601, 10-620, 10-628, 10-646.1, 10-657.2, 10-657.3 )
(   9-120, 9-1A-09, 9-1A-27, 9-1A-28, 9-1A-29, 9-1A-31 )
(   10-207, 10-307, 11-236 )
(   12-108, 13-207, 13-410, 7-246 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page