Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting - Permanent Absentee Ballot List, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that certain guidelines for absentee voting established by the State Board of Elections provide for a permanent absentee ballot list; providing that all voters are eligible for permanent absentee ballot status; requiring a voter to complete and submit certain information to request permanent absentee ballot status; prohibiting a voter who requests permanent absentee ballot status from receiving an absentee ballot for the next election if the request is made after a certain deadline; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {975260/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {153327/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (41-93)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {223023/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (43-89)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {833924/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (38-94)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {793427/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-94)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {833121/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-95)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174735/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-42)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {975260/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Floor Amendment {153327/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (41-93) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Floor Amendment {223023/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (43-89) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Floor Amendment {833924/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (38-94) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Floor Amendment {793427/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-94) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Floor Amendment {833121/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-95) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Permanent Absentee Ballot List
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {174735/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {174735/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-42) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Voting - Permanent Absentee Ballot List, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Reports
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 7:02 PM
Click to return on the top page