Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Uniform Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each health occupations board to request certain information from certain applicants and health care practitioners before issuing, renewing, or reinstating certain licenses, certificates, or registrations; requiring each health occupations board to post certain information on the board's website in a searchable format; requiring each health occupations board to provide an opportunity to certain applicants and health care practitioners to opt out of having phone numbers and e-mail addresses posted on certain websites; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations Boards - Uniform Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations Boards - Uniform Reporting
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page