Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone and Carr
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law specifying that certain provisions of law apply only to adoptions in which a juvenile court enters an order for adoption on or after January 1, 2000; altering, from 21 to 18, the age at which an adoptee, or biological parent if the adoptee is at least a certain age, may apply for a copy of certain birth and adoptions records; requiring the Director of Social Services to develop and make available a certain contact preference form; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0743
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-7)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-7) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-321, 5-339, 5-351, 5-359, 5-3A-19, 5-3A-35, 5-3A-42, 5-3B-21, 5-3B-29, 5-4B-01, 5-4B-02, 5-4B-11 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page