Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Judiciary, in consultation with domestic violence and child abuse organizations, to develop a training program for judges presiding over child custody cases involving child abuse or domestic violence and to review and update the training program at certain intervals; requiring the training program to include certain information; requiring the Maryland Judiciary to make information on a certain training program available on request; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0675
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
(   9-101.3, 9-101.4, 9-109 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page