Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Health Care Quality to monitor the compliance of assisted living facilities with requirements to provide educational and informational materials relating to immunization against influenza virus and immunization against pneumococcal disease during a certain annual inspection.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0707
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Finance 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page