Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and McIntosh
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose and authorized uses of the Maryland Corps Program Fund to include covering expenses incurred to study certain matters and providing funding to match certain gifts or grants; requiring, in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter, funds for the Maryland Corps Program to be as provided in the State budget to cover certain additional expenses; and requiring, for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $150,000 to the
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0845
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   24-1108, 24-1109 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page