Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the types of properties for which the tax collector in Prince George's County shall conduct a limited auction for property subject to tax liens to property that is a vacant lot or cited as vacant and unfit for habitation; altering eligibility requirements for certain individuals to submit bids in a certain limited auction; and providing that any payments received for a certain tax sale certificate that is void under certain circumstances shall be applied to any taxes on the property that are in arrears.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {765669/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {765669/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:47 AM
Click to return on the top page