Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services – Inmate Cost–of–Living Report – Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
Sponsored by
Delegates D.M. Davis, Mosby, Crutchfield, Pena-Melnyk, Acevero, Atterbeary, Barron, Boyce, Charkoudian, Dumais, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Henson, Ivey, J. Lewis, Lopez, Moon, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in a certain report certain statistics related to the cost of living of inmates at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in a certain report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain statistics regarding the race, age, and sex of certain inmates, disaggregated by job classification and wage scale.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-6)
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services – Inmate Cost–of–Living Report – Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services – Inmate Cost–of–Living Report – Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-6) 47BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
(   3-207, 3-509 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:14 PM
Click to return on the top page