Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Branch
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which an equity court is authorized to grant visitation rights to a grandparent of a child; requiring the court to consider the amount of personal contact that occurred between the grandparent and the child before the filing of the petition; specifying the circumstances under which an equity court is required to grant visitation rights to a grandparent; and prohibiting the court from denying visitation rights to a grandparent based on certain allegations, except under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:18 PM
Click to return on the top page